Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Quinn Jr, James B, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Open Mri Of Naples Inc, Powers, Steven, Weidenmiller, Casey K, Woods, Weidenmiller, Michetti & Rudnick, P.L., in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hayes, Hugh D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHayes, Hugh D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2014 |
CategoryProfessional Malpractice Other Professional |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Final Disposition Form
Date:Returned Mail
Date:Mediation Report
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Request for Production
Date:Motion to Compel
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal Weidenmiller, Casey K, Woods, Weidenmiller, Michetti & Rudnick, P.L.,, Open Mri Of Naples Inc,, Powers, Steven | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Recorded 2016-09-22 Instrument# 5314940 | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial docket 4/4/2017 beginning at 10:30 AM Friedman, David C (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to Magistrate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.