Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Any And All Unknown Parties, Arlene Hernandez, Unknown Tenant, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrodie, Lauren L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2014 |
CategoryHomestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Certificate of Service
Date:Motion for Continuance
Date:Witness List
Date:Mediation Report
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Exhibit List
Date:Motion for Sanctions
Date:Request for Production
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Cancelled Non-Jury Trial on 1/6/2017 9:00:00 AM due to per JACS - dismissal | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & Release of Lis Pendens Arlene Hernandez,, Any And All Unknown Parties, | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Set on Non-Jury Trial docket 1/6/2017 beginning at 9:00 AM Brodie, Lauren L (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Cancelled Non-Jury Trial on 10/14/2016 9:00:00 AM due to per JACS - to be reset |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.