Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Gallucci, Patricia, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Delise, Paul Charles, Lumetta, Joanne, Unknown Heirs Of The Estate Of Alice Lumetta, Unknown Heirs Of The Estate Of Connie Carauana, Unknown Heirs Of The Estate Of Elizabeth Grabowski, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2014 |
CategoryOther Real Property Action $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Order To Quiet Title Recorded 2016-02-09 Instrument# 5226412 | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Final Judgment by Gallucci, Patricia | |
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Default issued by clerk on Joanne Lumetta | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Clerk's Default on Lumetta, Joanne,Unknown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of William Lumetta,,Unkown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Joseph Lumetta,,Unknown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Alice Lumetta,,Unknown Persona | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit Lumetta, Joanne,Unknown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of William Lumetta,,Unkown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Joseph Lumetta,,Unknown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Alice Lumetta,,Unknown Personal Repre | |
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Not Entered | |
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Clerk's Default on Lumetta, Joanne,Unknown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of William Lumetta,,Unkown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Joseph Lumetta,,Unknown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Alice Lumetta,,Unknown Persona | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication for Unkown Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Joseph Lumetta,, published 10/30/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.