Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Adrian Petrila A K A Traian A Pertila A K A Trian Adrian Petrila, Prosults Realty Tampa Llc, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment - Granted | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Proceeding: Hearing | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Shenko, James R | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Costs | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Judgment on Adrian Petrila A/K/A Traian A Pertila A/K/A Trian Adrian Petrila,,Prosults Realty Tampa Llc, Recorded 2015-02-10 Instrument# 5082830 | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Summary Judgment | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Stand in Attorney Dianne Miller for Attorney Erik Zogg | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Per Judge's Calendar Motion For Summary Judgment @ 10:00 | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Set on Hearing docket 2/9/2015 beginning at 9:00 AM Shenko, James R (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.