Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Guillot, Jaime, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Campanale, Vito J., in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Mediation Report
Date:Mediation Roll Call
Date:Cover Letter
Date:Notice of Mediation
Date:Motion to Compel
Date:Notice of Unavailability
Date:Request for Production
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Cancelled Pre-Trial Conference on 6/24/2015 10:30:00 AM due to previously disposed | |
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Campanale, Vito J. | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
November 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Mediation Roll Call | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Set on Pre-Trial Conference docket 6/24/2015 beginning at 10:30 AM Friedman, David C (see notice of hearing for actual hearing time) | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Agreed Case Management Plan and Order | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to Magistrate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.