Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Fernandez, Jose A, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Unassigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Suggestion Of Bankruptcy On Behalf Of Jose A Fernandez Filed 4/9/10 9 10 Bk 08286 | |
March 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Answer By Jose A Fernandez | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Sheriff's Return Summons Jose A Fernandez/1/8/10 | |
January 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons Issued Jose A Fernandez/Sent To Collier County Sheriff On 1/6/10 | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.