Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beltran, Ivonne Lopez, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Covarrubias, Sergio, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
August 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibits Removed For Destruction | |
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerks Letter Re: Disposal Of Exhibits | |
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Undelivered Mail Sergio Covarrubias/Order Adopting Recommendation Of Magistrate | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Order On Recommended Order Dated 7/16/10 Granting Final Default Judgment | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Recommended Order Granting Motion For Entry Of Final Judgment By Default | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibits From Petitioner In Envelope In Vault | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: MJM | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Exceptions Period Applies | |
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Granted (In The Total Amount Of $18,659.37) Court Finds |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.