Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Carrington At Stonebridge Condo, Doe, Jane, Doe, John, Galanos, George P, Galanos, Kelli J, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Hugh D Hayes presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & Release of Lis Pendens | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Attorney for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Trustee to Farinas, Lauren | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Attorney for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Trustee to Farinas, Lauren | |
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Attorney for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Trustee to McDonald, Jason C | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Granting Substitution of Counsel for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Trustee (Plaintiff) with Holmes, Norman Rodney | |
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitution of Counsel | |
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation/Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance by Stemer, Sarah for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Trustee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.