Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Foreclosed Assets Sales & Transfer, Mtglq Investors Lp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Gonzales, Ariel Fonte, Mendez, Milagros, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Foster, Joseph G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2009 |
CategoryReal Property Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Krier, Elizabeth V | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Shenko, James R | |
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Scheduled Judge Reassignment By Administrative Order. Effective: 07/01/2014, Judge Frederick R Hardt To Judge James R Shenko | |
June 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Frederick R Hardt | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Scheduled Judge Reassignment By Administrative Order. Effective: 07/01/2012, From Judge Ramiro Manalich To Judge Frederick R Hardt | |
July 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Division Judge Reassignment Order From: Hugh D Hayes To Ramiro Manalich Ordered By G Keith Cary On 06/13/2011 | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Title To Foreclosed Assets Sales & Transfer Partnership | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Counsel To Clerk Regarding Doc Stamps | |
January 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Disbursement No Monies Disbursed | |
December 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Paid Hold Sale Fee Of $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.