Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Onewest Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Cacv Colorado Llc, Indymac Fed Bank Fsb, Lago, Carlos A, Mortgage Electronic Registration As Nominee Of, Reyes, Yaneisys, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by IndyMac Federal Bank FSB against Lourdes G. Zafra, Carlos A. Lago, and any unknown parties claiming an interest in the property. The complaint alleges that on February 1, 2007, a promissory ...
Non-Military Affidavit Carlos A Lago
Date: September 10, 2009Order Of Substitution Of Counsel
Date: April 01, 2010Voluntary Dismissal Tenants 2, 3, & 4
Date: July 31, 2009Non-Military Affidavit Unknown Tenant N/K/A Yaneisys Reyes
Date: October 27, 2009Order for Non-Jury Trial
Date: March 16, 2012Notice of Hearing for Motion To Withdraw
Date: May 09, 2012Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Carlos A Lago 1/6/09
Date: February 26, 2009Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc 1/6/09
Date: February 26, 2009Reply To Request For Production By Plaintiff
Date: April 21, 2009Order for Referral to Magistrate
Date: May 09, 2012Bid Sheet $90,500.00/3Rd Party
Date: July 23, 2012Response To Defendant Lourdes G Zafra A/K/A Lourdes Zafra's Answer And Affirmative Defenses
Date: September 27, 2011Order Granting Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Zafra, Lourdes G (Defendant)
Date: June 07, 2012Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Cynthia A Pivacek
Date: June 30, 2012Notice To Produce Documents Propounded To Plaintiff
Date: February 03, 2009Notice Of Intent To Dismiss For Lack Of Prosecution Hearing 8/4/11 1:30
Date: May 19, 2011Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel Brian Alvarez For Plaintiff
Date: April 01, 2010Original Note Promissory and/or Mortgage and Notice of Filing
Date: November 02, 2009Report & Recommendations of the Magistrate
Date: May 15, 2012Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel
Date: April 01, 2010Notice Of Lis Pendens
Date: December 31, 2008Notice of Foreclosure Sale
Date: May 22, 2012Final Judgment of Foreclosure
Date: May 22, 2012Correspondence From Counsel To Judge
Date: April 01, 2010Cover Letter
Date: May 22, 2012Undelivered Mail Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc/Mnj
Date: May 27, 2011Complaint
Date: December 31, 2008Correspondence From Counsel To Clerk
Date: September 10, 2009Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Lourdes G Zafra A/K/A Lourdes Zafra 1/6/09
Date: February 26, 2009Witness & Exhibit List by Onewest Bank Fsb (Plaintiff)
Date: March 28, 2012Motion For Substitution Of Party Plaintiff
Date: June 23, 2011Affidavit Of Disinterested Attorney As To Fees
Date: July 08, 2009Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference
Date: January 24, 2012Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Cacv Of Colorado Llc 1/6/09
Date: February 26, 2009Certificate of Disbursement $90,500.00
Date: August 06, 2012Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record
Date: February 09, 2012Correspondence From Counsel To Clerk
Date: October 27, 2009Affidavit As To Amounts Due & Owing
Date: July 13, 2009Affidavit of Publication
Date: July 16, 2012Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2008Answer & Affirmative Defenses By Lourdes G Zafra A/K/A Lourdes Zafra
Date: February 03, 2009Order Granting Motion To Substitute Party Plaintiff
Date: June 28, 2011Motion For Summary Judgment With Attached Affidavi And Attorney Fees And Costs
Date: October 27, 2009Affidavit Of Non-Service Of Summons Tenant #2
Date: February 26, 2009Proceeding Motion Hearing on: 09/22/2011 @ 13:30
Date: September 22, 2011Notice Of Filing Affidavit As To Reasonable Attys Fees
Date: July 08, 2009Default Issued On Unknown Tenant 1 N/K/A Yaneisys Reyes
Date: October 30, 2009Motion For Default On Unknown Tenant 1 N/K/A Yaneisys Reyes
Date: October 27, 2009Notice of Filing
Date: May 08, 2012Notice Of Filing Affidavit As To Amounts Due & Owing
Date: July 13, 2009Notice of Hearing for Motion For Summary Judgment @ 10:00
Date: May 09, 2012Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Tenant #1 N/K/A Yaneisys Reyes 1/6/09
Date: February 26, 2009Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference /S/Manalich 09/22/11 Pre-Trial Set For 01/09/12 @ 9:00 Am
Date: September 22, 2011Proceeding Motion Hearing on: 04/27/2010 @ 13:30
Date: April 27, 2010Paid $92,498.50 on receipt 420537, Fully Paid
Date: July 24, 2012Cover Letter
Date: February 09, 2012Paid $70.00 on receipt 420321, Balance Due: $633.50
Date: July 23, 2012Undelivered Mail Albertelli Law/Order On Notice Of No Record Activity/Remailed
Date: July 22, 2011Paid $4,525.00 on receipt 420110, Fully Paid
Date: July 23, 20123rd Party Issuance of Title Information
Date: July 23, 2012Affidavit of Indebtedness
Date: May 08, 2012Affidavit of Publication
Date:Order for Non-Jury Trial
Date:No Show
Date:Notice Of Lis Pendens
Date:Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
August 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Disburse - Registry | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursement $90,500.00 | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title to Florida Rental Specialists, Llc As Trustee For The 2142 55Th Street Sw Land Trust | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale to Florida Rental Specialists, Llc As Trustee For The 2142 55Th Street Sw Land Trust | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Paid $92,498.50 on receipt 420537, Fully Paid | |
July 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Deposit - Registry | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet $90,500.00/3Rd Party | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Paid $70.00 on receipt 420321, Balance Due: $633.50 | |
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Paid $4,525.00 on receipt 420110, Fully Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.