Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Structured Asset Mortgage, Wells Fargo Bank Na Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Lafferty, James F, Tenant #1, Tenant #2, Tenant #3, Tenant #4, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL, . Collier County, FL Superior Courts with Krier, Elizabeth V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCollier County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Lauren L Brodie
Date: June 30, 2012Suggestion of Bankruptcy Lafferty, James F
Date: January 31, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Hardt, Frederick R | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Shenko, James R | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Scheduled Judge Reassignment By Administrative Order. Effective: 07/01/2014, Judge Lauren L Brodie To Judge James R Shenko | |
June 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Lauren L Brodie | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Scheduled Judge Reassignment By Administrative Order. Effective: 07/01/2012, From Judge Ramiro Manalich To Judge Lauren L Brodie | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Bankruptcy Lafferty, James F | |
July 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Division Judge Reassignment Order From: Cynthia A Pivacek To Ramiro Manalich Ordered By G Keith Cary On 06/13/2011 | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Of Dismissal Of Case & Cancelling Notice Of Lis Pendens | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form Settlement Before Hearing | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Counsel To Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.