Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Hucks, James Phillip Iii, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | RECALL CASE FROM COLLECTIONS - MSB | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - PERDUE BRANDON | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - MSB COLLECTION AGENCY | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/14/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $137.00 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR017077 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEYMGHE | |
September 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.