Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Stanley, Mathew Alan, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 07, 2021DISPOSITION
Date: February 15, 2022D6 CLEARED
Date: January 03, 2022PAYMENT $181.00 RECEIPT #120697
Date: January 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUSE | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUSE | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $181.00 RECEIPT #120697 | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUSE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUSE | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/07/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $181.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.