Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Starling, Alaina Bobetta Marie, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - LINEBARGER COLLECTION AGENCY | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/07/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $187.00 | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEYMBGE | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR016883 | |
September 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.