Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Anderson, Natasha Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 06, 2021PAYMENT $164.00 RECEIPT #106456
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | SCHOOL CERTIFICATE SENT BACK TO PORTAL ELECTION NOT MADE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $164.00 RECEIPT #106456 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC1E | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC1E | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEYMC1E | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR016868 | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.