Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Zrs Management For Arbors At Orange Park, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Green, Trinity Arianna, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryEviction Residential/Non-Monetary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a legal action filed by ZRS Management LLC as the manager for Arbors at Orange Park against Trinity Green. The complaint seeks to evict Trinity Green from a property located at 198 Arora Boulevard #80 in Orange Park, Florida. The Pl...
EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 30, 2021COUNT I EVICTION EXECUTED POSTED 10/8/21
Date: October 17, 2021VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/18/2021 7:01 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021065586
Date: October 15, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: October 07, 2021MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: October 07, 2021EVICTION COMPLAINT - COUNT I ONLY
Date: September 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNT I EVICTION EXECUTED POSTED 10/8/21 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 10/18/2021 7:01 AM / RECEPTION #: 2021065586 | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | EVICTION COMPLAINT - COUNT I ONLY | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CC001317 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.