Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Vidal Campuzano, Gustavo Adolfo, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: September 07, 2021DISPOSITION
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 11, 2021PAYMENT $129.00 RECEIPT #118947
Date: December 15, 2021SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: October 19, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: October 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $129.00 RECEIPT #118947 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUPE | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUPE | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEWQUPE | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING TO ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.