Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Provost, Rickey Lee, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOLLINS, TIMOTHY R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION FILED
Date: January 20, 2021DISPOSITION
Date: May 04, 2021CLERK'S COVER LETTER
Date: May 05, 2021PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #86117
Date: April 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 26, 2021PAYMENT $181.00 RECEIPT #102412
Date: August 16, 2021D6 CLEARED
Date: April 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $181.00 RECEIPT #102412 | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED TRANS ID 67986952 | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | RE-D6 ISSUED 08/05/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $181.00 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S COVER LETTER | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A1OY9LE | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A1OY9LE | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #86117 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.