Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Neurotech Family & Physical Medicine As Assignee Of Tamela Swanson, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against United Services Automobile Association, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOBLEY, KRISTINA K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $0-$99 |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
SMALL CLAIMS CHECKLIST
Date: September 23, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 13, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: May 06, 2022DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Date: January 14, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER JURY GENERAL
Date: October 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 15, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 26, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 5/9/2022 4:30 PM / RECEPTION #: 2022029527 | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.