Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Smith, Terri M, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with SKINNER, JOHN H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear
Date: October 23, 2018Notice to Appear
Date: October 23, 2018Provisional Order Appointing Public Defender
Date: October 23, 2018Change Of Charge Transfer To County Court
Date: November 28, 2018Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear
Date: November 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Change Of Charge Transfer To County Court | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Deft in court with/without atty for review, ct reset for | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Financial Affidavit Declared Indigent by Examiner | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notif To Bondsman For Deft To Appear | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Provisional Order Appointing Public Defender | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Surety Bond | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Arrest and Booking Report | |
October 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Conditions Pretrial Release-No Contact Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.