Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Williams, Shaquita, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Humphries, Jeffrey J, against Orange Park Mall, Llc, represented by Hanratty, James Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with SHARRIT, MICHAEL S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2017 |
CategoryOther Negligence - Premises Liability Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:
Date: November 30, 2017Order Setting Jury Trial & Pretrial 9/16/19
Date: January 31, 2019Order (Generic) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 21, 2019Order (Generic) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL RULE 1.310(6) WITNESS
Date: February 21, 2019Notice of Service of Answer to Defendant's Expert Interrogatories
Date: March 12, 2019Notice Of Mediation Conference 8.30.19 at 9 am
Date: June 06, 2019Disposition of mediation conference
Date: September 05, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 201720 Day Summons Issued as to: Orange Park Mall, LLC
Date: December 01, 2017Notice of Service of Interrogatories to Defendant
Date: December 05, 2017Notice of Service NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO SHAQUITA WILLIAMS
Date: February 16, 2018Trial Set Memorandum
Date: May 21, 2018Notice Of Mediation Conference 12.14.18 at 9 am
Date: September 19, 2018Motion for Extension of Time Ornage Park Mall, LLC
Date: September 19, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of Charles Haffner
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of Aubrey Darr
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of Troy Hathaway set for 10.2.18 at 11 am
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Cancellation of Deposition
Date: November 12, 2018Notice of Service PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 02, 2018Notice of Cancellation
Date: October 22, 2018Order Setting Jury Trial & Pretrial Pre-Trial 2/19/19 at 9:30 am; Trial March 4, 2019
Date: December 21, 2018Notice PLAINTIFF'S TREATING MEDICAL PROVIDER AND/OR EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement
Date: January 09, 2019Notice Of Mediation Conference
Date: January 10, 2019Disposition of mediation conference The parties reached an impasse as to all issues.
Date: January 17, 2019Notice of Service
Date: January 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - RECORDED (RECORD DATE: 1/8/2020 1:32 PM / RECEPTION #: 2020001239 | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Disposition of mediation conference | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Response (Generic) DEFENDANT ORANGE PARK MALL LLC'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition 8.29.19 AT 3 PM; DR. TED MITCHELL; AMENDED DATE AND LOCATION | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice DEFENDANT ORANGE PARK MALL, LLC'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Taking Deposition 3:00 p.m. on August 23, 2019 | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 08-29-19 at 9:00am | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Taking Deposition | |
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 29th day of August, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.