Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Us Bank National Association As Trustee For Harbor, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kopf, Jennifer, against American Express Bank Fsb, American Express Centurion Bank, Msni Fund Vi Llc, Nye, Deja Dianna, Nye, Stephen D, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with COX, ANGELA M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2017 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mtg.Fore./Non-Homestead Res.Fore.$250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF PENDING BANKRUPTCY
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Date: June 08, 2021MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 09, 2021MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 02, 2022MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER ON MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: January 20, 2023PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF FILING
Date: January 05, 202320 Day Summons Issued as to: Deja Dianna Nye
Date: December 01, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment on Foreclosure
Date: July 26, 2018Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:
Date: November 30, 2017Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim
Date: November 30, 2017Default
Date: July 18, 2018Motion To Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: March 07, 2019Reply TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS, STEPHEN D. NYE AND DEJA NYE
Date: October 09, 2018NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY ORDER DISMISSING CASE
Date: April 21, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY EMAIL
Date: January 24, 2023AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: October 20, 202311/07/2018 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: LESTER, DON)
Date: November 07, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 31, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 17, 2018Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: April 17, 2019Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: November 30, 2017Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: May 17, 2018Answer Defendant's Answer and Claim for Surplus Money
Date: July 05, 201820 Day Summons Issued as to: American Express Bank, FSB c/o President/Vice-President/Chairperson
Date: December 01, 2017Final Disposition Form
Date: November 07, 2018Notice of Sale
Date: March 12, 2019Answer/Affirmative Defenses Defendant's
Date: September 22, 2018Certificate of Service
Date: May 17, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2019Proposed Notice of Sale
Date: October 25, 2018Order Appointing Process Server
Date: January 04, 2018Complaint
Date: November 30, 2017EXHIBITS FILED INTO EVIDENCE- ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 13 CASE
Date: April 21, 2020Notice of Dropping Party
Date: July 18, 2018Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded
Date: November 30, 201720 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Parties in Possession #1
Date: December 01, 201720 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Parties in Possession #2
Date: December 01, 2017Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:
Date: May 17, 2018Motion for Default/Default
Date: July 18, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 31, 2020PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #216985
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Sale
Date: November 08, 2018COPY OF AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: October 31, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: October 20, 202320 Day Summons Issued as to: MSNI Fund VI, LLC c/o Tyler Eugene Happe, R.A.
Date: December 01, 201720 Day Summons Issued as to: River Hills Reserve Owners Sub-Association, Inc.
Date: December 01, 2017Motion to Cancel Foreclosure Sale
Date: February 11, 2019Affidavit/Proof Of Indebtedness
Date: July 26, 2018Clerks Cover Letter
Date: February 14, 2019Certificate of Mailing/Service Notice of Sale
Date: November 08, 2018Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: November 30, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 20, 2023Affidavit of Attorney's Fees
Date: August 09, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: November 30, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: January 24, 202320 Day Summons Issued as to: Stephen D. Nye
Date: December 01, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 06, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 14, 2019CERTIFICATE OF E-SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: March 29, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE
Date: July 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 24, 2023SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: February 23, 2023SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: December 12, 2023ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 13, 2022PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #141897
Date: June 06, 2022Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: March 12, 2019PROPOSED NOTICE OF SALE
Date: June 21, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER OF DISMISSING
Date: August 31, 2023SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: July 19, 2022Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 3/21/19; 3/28/19
Date: April 23, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #6982
Date: October 25, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: September 02, 2021CERTIFICATE OF E-SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: August 26, 2021PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #101780
Date: August 11, 2021SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: December 12, 2023PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #173582
Date: January 12, 2023NOTICE OF SALE 7/20/2022 AT 10AM
Date: June 24, 2022MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: October 23, 2019NOTICE OF SALE
Date: August 18, 2021CLERK'S LETTER
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER
Date: June 21, 2022ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 13 CASE
Date: January 05, 2023NOTICE OF SALE PROPOSED
Date: October 23, 2019ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 13 CASE
Date: August 31, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 02, 2023ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: January 13, 2023PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #147196
Date: July 12, 2022Certificate of Mailing/Service Notice of Sale
Date: March 12, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDING BANKRUPTCY | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT ADVANCES | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION/NOTICE OF SALE | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SALE | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE | |
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.