Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA vs. GLORIA LAREAU
On December 29, 2016 a small claims monetary $2501<$5000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL. Judge COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 29, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Clay County, FL
Category
Small Claims Monetary $2501<$5000
Practice Area
Small Claims
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Notice of Dismissal
Date: Mar 12, 2018Order on Extension of Time 120 Days or case dismissed
Date: Dec 13, 2017Motion for Extension of Time
Date: Dec 06, 2017Docket Sheet no return
Date: Jan 31, 2017Motion to Appoint Process Server Amended
Date: Jan 25, 2017Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: Dec 29, 2016Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: Dec 29, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order on Extension of Time 120 Days or case dismissed | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion, Notice & Judgment hearing set for December 18, 2017 at 9:30am | |
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit /Return Service as to Gloria Lareau; 02/01/2017; NonServed - Not sent out for service | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet no return | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Appoint Process Server Amended | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons Notice to Appear Issued isssued from Efile; Pretrial: 01/31/2017 at 1pm | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Appoint Process Server | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons to be Issued by Clerk | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Designation of Primary E-Mail Address |