Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Florida Department Of Transporation, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Maxon, Ralph P, Saavedra, Veronica, against Burris, Sherri, Ring, Teresa, Smith, Joyce Ann, Weeks, Jimmy, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with WHITTINGTON, STEVEN B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2016 |
CategoryEminent Domain-No Fee |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:
Date: December 28, 2016Final Judgment Stipulated
Date: July 03, 2018Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded
Date: December 06, 2016Receipt Parcel 119
Date: February 15, 2017Notice of Action Issued as to:
Date: January 06, 2017Notice of Action Issued as to:
Date: January 05, 2017Notice of Cancellation
Date: February 03, 2017Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: January 10, 2017Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: December 28, 2016Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: February 10, 2017Final Disposition Form
Date: July 30, 201820 Day Summons Issued to show cause and notice of hearing date
Date: December 28, 2016Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 06, 2016Receipt Parcel #119
Date: July 16, 2018Certificate of Clerk
Date: February 15, 2017Disposition of mediation conference
Date: May 18, 2018Notice of Appearance Plaintiff
Date: April 11, 2018Order Appointing Process Server
Date: January 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Check Released From Registry | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt Parcel #119 | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Check Request to Administration | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Judgment Stipulated | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Entry of Stipulated Final Judgment | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Disposition of mediation conference | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance Plaintiff | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Amended | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.