Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Eddins, Delight Appleby, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Court Action Aff of def, nc-wh $158 w/in 90 days
Date: June 03, 2016D6 Cleared aff of defense
Date: May 26, 2016Citation
Date: December 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Action Aff of def, nc-wh $158 w/in 90 days | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Recalled from Collections | |
June 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Update File Sent to Collection Agency | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | D6 Cleared aff of defense | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous advised def of options. wants to come in and do aff of def, advised of $23 late fee due | |
May 07, 2016 | Docket Event | File Sent to Linebarger | |
May 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Sent to Collections - Linebarger | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | D6 Executed by Aging - Fail to Pay | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.