Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Melvin, Sheryl Kay, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Citation
Date: December 29, 2015D6 Cleared court date set
Date: April 19, 2016Court Action Ng-g $262 f/w (fta)
Date: June 10, 2016D6 Cleared
Date: June 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | D6 Cleared | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event | D6 Executed by Aging - Fail to Pay | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Court Action Ng-g $262 f/w (fta) | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | D6 Cleared court date set | |
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | D6 Executed by Aging - Fail to Pay | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.