Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Sapitan, Karen Leith, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Citation
Date: September 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - LINEBARGER COLLECTION AGENCY | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Correction to Remove-Order Closing Case Tobacco | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Closing Case - Tobacco | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | File Sent to Linebarger | |
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Sent to Collections - Linebarger | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | D6 Executed by Aging - Fail to Pay | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.