Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hunters Run Ltd With Gp Peninsula Hunters Run Ll, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lowenhaupt, Kenneth J, against Azar, Justin, Bowman, Rachelle, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COLLINS, TIMOTHY R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 31, 2015Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: December 31, 2015Eviction Summons Issued efiled as to Justin Azar
Date: December 31, 2015Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90
Date: February 16, 2016Returned Mail to tenants - Final Judtgment
Date: February 16, 2016Eviction Summons Issued efiled as to Rachelle Bowman
Date: December 31, 2015Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: January 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit /Return Service executed Writ of Possession to Rachel Bland 2/18/16 | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Sent to CCSO w/ $90 | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail to tenants - Final Judtgment | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | 02/09/2016 Final Judgment, Final Judgment (Judicial Officer: COLLINS, TIMOTHY R) | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Setting Trial/Hearing Hearing set for 2/9/16 at 9:00am ..only IF rent monies of $1750 are deposited by Noon on 2/8/16 | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer emailed to JA for review | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Count I eviction executed as to: Rachelle Brown date: 01/19/2016 how served: Posted Residential | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Count I eviction executed as to: Justin Azar date: 01/19/2016 how served: Posted Residential | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing/Service | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.