Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hernando Hma Llc Dba Bayfront Health Spring Hill, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Lotane, Troy R., against Hallonquist, Benjamin, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with MOBLEY, KRISTINA K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2015 |
CategorySmall Claims Monetary $501<$2500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: November 10, 2016Docket Sheet unexecuted
Date: November 12, 2015Docket Sheet
Date: December 07, 2016Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: October 07, 2015Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: September 30, 2015Order Appointing Process Server
Date: November 06, 2015Alias Summons Issued efiled; NTA for Pretrial on 12/6/16 at 1pm
Date: November 10, 2016Summons to be Issued by Clerk
Date: March 20, 2017Pluries Summons Issued 5/9/17 @ 1:00pm - issued from efile
Date: March 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Order (Generic) on Continuance of Pre-Trial | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit /Return Service Notice to Apear non-served uable to make contact | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons to be Issued by Clerk | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Pluries Summons Issued 5/9/17 @ 1:00pm - issued from efile | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Unexecuted Summons Returned as to Benjamin Hallonquist; NonServed 11/30/16 | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons to be Issued by Clerk | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Issued efiled; NTA for Pretrial on 12/6/16 at 1pm | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Order (Generic) on Continuance of Pre-Trial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.