Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Schellenberg, Shelly, against Griffin, Barry P, Griffin, Patricia B, United States Of America Internal Revenue Service, Unknown Tenant 1, Unknown Tenant 2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COX, ANGELA M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryReal Prop/Mtg./Homestead Residence Fore. $50,001-$249.999 |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Certificate Of No Disbursement
Date: March 12, 2018Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: March 12, 2018Returned Mail Patricia Griffin
Date: January 31, 2018Certificate of Title
Date: March 12, 2018Certificate Of Sale W/Proof of Publication
Date: February 27, 2018Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: February 27, 2018Motion To Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 19, 2018Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 2/1/18; 2/8/18
Date: February 09, 2018Returned Mail as to Barry Griffin
Date: January 29, 2018Returned Mail as to Occupant
Date: January 31, 2018Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: January 25, 2018Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: January 25, 2018Notice of Sale
Date: January 25, 2018Motion To Reschedule Foreclosure Sale Filed by Plaintiff
Date: September 29, 2016Notice of Sale 09/19/16 at 10:00am;
Date: July 20, 2016Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: July 21, 2016Motion To Reschedule Foreclosure Sale Filed by Plaintiff
Date: November 01, 2016Returned Mail Notice of Sale Sent to Occupant; Returned Undelivered
Date: October 11, 2016Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: October 21, 2016Returned Mail Notice of Sale Sent to Barry P Griffin; Returned Undelivered
Date: October 11, 2016Motion To Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: September 07, 2016Notice of Sale 11/02/16 at 10:00am
Date: October 04, 2016Returned Mail Notice of Sale Sent to Partricia B Griffin; Returned Undelivered
Date: October 11, 2016Certificate of Mailing/Service
Date: October 04, 2016Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: August 05, 2016Notice of Dropping Party
Date: March 16, 2016Notice of Filing Military Status Affidavit for Barry P Giffin and Patricia B Griffin
Date: March 16, 2016Final Disposition Form
Date: July 20, 2016Notice of Action Issued as to: Barry Griffin, Patricia Griffin
Date: February 22, 2016Motion for Default/Default BARRY P. GRIFFIN; and PATRICIA B. GRIFFIN
Date: May 09, 2016Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale
Date: March 18, 2016Default Barry Griffin, Patricia Griffin
Date: May 09, 2016Affidavit of Reasonable Attorney's fees
Date: April 13, 2016Default
Date: May 09, 2016Order Appointing Process Server
Date: January 08, 2016Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry of Patricia B Griffin
Date: February 19, 201620 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant 2
Date: December 31, 2015Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to:
Date: December 29, 2015Notice of Action Issued as to:
Date: February 19, 201620 Day Summons Issued as to:Patricia B Griffin
Date: January 06, 2016Affidavit of Diligent Search and Inquiry
Date: February 19, 201620 Day Summons Issued as to: USA c/o US Attorney
Date: December 31, 2015Value of Real Property or Mortgage Foreclosure Claim
Date: December 29, 201520 Day Summons Issued as to: Barry Griffin
Date: December 31, 201520 Day Summons Issued as to: Unknown Tenant 1
Date: December 31, 2015Motion to Appoint Process Server
Date: December 29, 2015Notice Lis Pendens/Recorded
Date: December 29, 2015Complaint
Date: December 29, 2015Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Of No Disbursement | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing/Service | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Sale W/Proof of Publication | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing/Service | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof Of Publication/Notice of Sale 2/1/18; 2/8/18 | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Patricia Griffin | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail as to Occupant | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail as to Barry Griffin | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.