Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Fields, Ramonda Elise, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with TOWNSEND, RICHARD R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Citation
Date: December 31, 2013Court Action AFF OF DEF, NC-WH $158 W/IN 30 DAYS
Date: September 29, 2014D6 Cleared
Date: September 23, 2014D6 Cleared
Date: December 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Close Case File Sent to Collection Agency | |
December 01, 2014 | Docket Event | D6 Cleared | |
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | D6 Executed by Aging - Fail to Pay | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Mail Returned by Post Office as Undeliverable | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Recalled from Collections | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Mail Returned by Post Office as Undeliverable | |
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Update File Sent to Collection Agency | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Court Action AFF OF DEF, NC-WH $158 W/IN 30 DAYS | |
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case sent to Collection Agency | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Recalled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.