Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lankhorst, Jason, Lankhorst, Rachelle, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bielecky, William C, Warwick, Brian William, against Water Equipment Technologies, Inc. Of Florida, represented by Coultoff, Daniel, Klein, Jason H, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with BORELLO, MARK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2011 |
CategoryContract Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is a motion filed by the defendants, WATER EQUIPMENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. OF FLORIDA and JEFFREY L. STANPHILL, requesting an enlargement of time to respond to the plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint. The plaintiffs, JASON an...
Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to: Jeffery Stanphill
Date: July 22, 2011Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance
Date: October 21, 2011Civil Cover Sheet
Date: July 22, 2011Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint
Date: January 16, 2012Summons to be Issued by Clerk as to: John Wilfong
Date: July 22, 2011Alias Summons Issued as to:Water Equipment Technologies Inc of Florida
Date: August 10, 2011Notice of Appearance
Date: September 06, 2011Motion to Dismiss/Vacate PLAINTIFFS? CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 27, 2011Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance
Date: October 27, 2011Acceptance of Service Notice of appearance
Date: November 30, 2011Notice of Dismissal
Date: May 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff's | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Order (Generic) on Pltf's Motion to Lift Stay - Granted | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal w/o prejudice of defendant, Water Equipment Technologies Inc of Fl. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion defendant's Water Equipment Technologies Inc of Fl. motion to dismiss | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous plaintiffs' response in opposition to defendant | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (order signed in United States Distrist Ct | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing certain pleadings in support of defendants' response in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to lift stay | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (Order from United States District Ct.) | |
April 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Response (Generic) Plaintiff's reply to defendant's response in opposition to Plaintiff's motion to lift stay |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.