Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Smith, Cynthia L, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against State Farm Mutual, Maxwell, Jennifer, Weisgerber, Theresa L, represented by Taylor, Debra, O'Hara, Jerilynn M, Clay, Alexis M, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL, . Clay County, FL Superior Courts with COX, ANGELA M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClay County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Party defendant; Jennifer N Maxwell; only | |
March 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal as to state farm | |
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of ex parte hearing on plaikntiff's motion to set for trial | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of acceptance of def, theresa weisgerber's proposal of settlement | |
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Serving Proposal for Settlement | |
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of proposal for settlement to pltf | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Response (Generic) 9th Response to RFC | |
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Service proposal for settlement | |
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of serving proposal for settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.