Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with HEALIS, KRISTIE M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2023 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Fc >50 <249 |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
The legal document is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank National Association against Justin Alford in Citrus County, Florida. The complaint alleges a default in payments under a promissory note and Purchase Money Mortgage, seeking to foreclose ...
PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2024PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE FOR READINESS FOR TRIAL
Date: February 26, 2024PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Date: February 06, 2024PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED
Date: February 26, 2024PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL
Date: February 06, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT E - RECORDED (OR.3443.1100. / 2024007125)
Date: February 06, 2024ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2024MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED
Date: February 06, 2024REPLY TO ANSWER
Date: January 25, 2024PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 21, 2024NOTICE OF STATUS & COMPLETION OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2024PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPROVE CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: January 21, 2024PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT (JUSTIN ALFORD)
Date: January 21, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: January 19, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE-UNSERVED
Date: January 19, 2024CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: January 08, 2024PAYMENT $954.00 RECEIPT #2023052674
Date: December 20, 2023REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: December 19, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: December 19, 2023VERIFIED COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: December 19, 2023VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY ON MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: December 19, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS E - RECORDED (OR.3433.904. / 2023073261)
Date: December 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAUT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR READINESS FOR TRIAL | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF INTENT TO OFFER AT TRIAL | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT E - RECORDED (OR.3443.1100. / 2024007125) | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | REPLY TO ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.