Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution-Pro Se |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $18.00 RECEIPT #2021035795 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE E - Recorded (OR.3170.2354. / 2021037316) | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | (AMENDED AS TO THE DATE OF THE HEARING)NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE USING ZOOM VIDEO/ TELEPHONE CONFERENCING | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING BEFORE THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE USING ZOOM VIDEO/ TELEPHONE CONFERENCING | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR FINAL HEARING | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.