Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryEminent Domain Main |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS E - Recorded (OR.3197.959. / 2021057461)
Date: August 18, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 18, 2021DECLARATION OF TAKING
Date: August 18, 2021ANSWER TO PETITION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING OF DEFENDANT NAJIR LLC
Date: November 02, 2021CORRESPONDENCE
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 17, 2022NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 16, 2021ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITRUS COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 23, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: September 23, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH RESPECT TO DISCOVERY RESPONSE (EXHIBITS)
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF FILING OF RIGHT OF WAY MAPS
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING ON ORDER OF TAKING (EVIDENTIARY HEARING)
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF DEFENDANT NAJIR LLCS OBJECTION TO PETITIONERS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: January 21, 2022DEFENDANT NAJIR LLCS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: December 23, 2021LETTER OF COLLECTION
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 08, 2021AMENDED DECLARATION OF TAKING
Date: December 06, 2021DEFENDANTS NAJIR LLCS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 23, 2021PETITIONERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NAJIR LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 24, 2022DEFENDANT NAJIR LLCS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PETITIONER
Date: December 23, 2021MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO THE TAX COLLECTOR
Date: January 17, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: August 18, 2021PETITION
Date: August 18, 2021ESCROW E-PORTAL REQUEST
Date: August 18, 2021PAYMENT $2,362,450.00 RECEIPT #2022018977
Date: May 13, 2022STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF TAKING AND FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2022AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO THE TAX COLLECTOR
Date: May 04, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 4/27
Date: April 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT
Date: June 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT | |
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $2,362,450.00 RECEIPT #2022018977 | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO THE TAX COLLECTOR | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AND FINAL JUDGMENT INCLUDING ATTORNEYS' FEES & EXPERTS' FEES & COSTS -E - Recorded (OR.3280.1630. / 2022032076) | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF TAKING AND FINAL JUDGMENT | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 4/27 | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITIONERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NAJIR LLC FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PETITIONERS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS NAJIR LLCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.