Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 14, 2022AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME
Date: February 02, 2022DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: December 19, 2021PLAINTIFFS REPLY
Date: January 06, 2022DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 14, 2022PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME
Date: January 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: January 23, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 24, 2022DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 19, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: December 19, 2021AMENDED DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: December 19, 2021PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: November 19, 2021AGREED ORDER
Date: December 09, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: January 23, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: December 19, 2021AGREED ORDER
Date: October 19, 2021NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AND INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 11, 2021NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE
Date: October 21, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Date: November 04, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE
Date: September 23, 2021DEFENDANT MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY
Date: October 04, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 19, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: August 05, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT
Date: August 05, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: September 22, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: August 05, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: September 22, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 01, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021031547
Date: August 16, 2021AGREED ORDER
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: September 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF LIQUIDATION INJUNCTION AND AUTOMATIC STAY AS TO AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - NOTICE OF FILING | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS PETITION FOR CONSENT OF LIQUIDATION AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY AND APPLICABLE STATUS - NOTICE OF FILING | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL | |
January 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
January 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REPLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.