Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: July 16, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: July 16, 2021PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC
Date: July 16, 2021PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO DEFENDANT R T BROWN INC
Date: July 16, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: August 16, 2021SUMMONS
Date: August 16, 2021ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Date: August 11, 2021JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT R T BROWN INC
Date: August 16, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INCS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 17, 2021ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021DEFENDANT REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 03, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT R T BROWN INCS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 17, 2021DEFENDANT R T BROWNS INC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: August 31, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HIS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF BODILY INJURY INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 03, 2021DEFENDANT RT BROWN INCS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 09, 2021DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INCS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS REPORT
Date: August 16, 2021ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 06, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INCS SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 14, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: September 29, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES
Date: March 15, 2022DEFENDANT R T BROWN INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 23, 2021DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 25, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON-PARTIES
Date: February 04, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: February 14, 2022DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INCS INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 11, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS AND CASE STATUS REPORT
Date: August 20, 2021DEFENDANT R T BROWNS INC REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 23, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT RT BROWN INCS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT R. T BROWN INC
Date: September 15, 2021PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 02, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 10, 2021PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY/NON- PARTIES
Date: October 01, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT R T BROWN INCS REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY / NON-PARTIES
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON-PARTIES
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON-PARTIES
Date: December 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 11, 2021CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY / NON PARTIES
Date: December 23, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON PARTIES
Date: December 28, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 03, 2022DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INCS NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF FABRE DEFENDANT
Date: January 06, 2022DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INCS NOTICE AND DESIGNATION OF FABRE DEFENDANT
Date: January 06, 2022DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: January 03, 2022DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INCS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INC
Date: December 28, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 07, 2022DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL INCS SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 06, 2021CROSSNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 28, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: January 13, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 05, 2022PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT R.T.BROWN INC
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: January 07, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 18, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT R T BROWN INCS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 27, 2022DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INCS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 02, 2022REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 11, 2022DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INCS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 28, 2021DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INCS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: December 28, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 19, 2022SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 14, 2022DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSITALS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT R.T. BROWNS REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING SOCIAL MEDIA INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 14, 2022DEFENDANT R. T. BRONW INCS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: February 04, 2022CANCELLATION OF CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 08, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 16, 2022PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2021027842
Date: July 19, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON PARTIES
Date: May 04, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: August 18, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 17, 2022CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER
Date: October 04, 2022JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 30, 2022PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INCS REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITALS SOCIAL MEDIA INTERROGATORIES | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY/NON PARTIES | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT CITRUS MEMORIAL HOSPITALS SOCIAL MEDIA INTERROGATORIES | |
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT R.T. BROWN INC D/B/A BROWN FUNERAL HOME AND CREMATORYS NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.