Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 09, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: July 09, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 09, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: October 05, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: August 01, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: July 29, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF DORATTA WATT
Date: October 05, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF DORATTA WATT
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF DORATTA WATTS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: November 24, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: February 04, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 04, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF DORATTA WATTS INITIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 11, 2021EXHIBIT (A) - CORRESPONDENCE
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 10, 2022MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: January 06, 2022AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 04, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT (B) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 09, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 05, 2021DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: October 06, 2021DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 06, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: February 10, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF DORATTA WATT
Date: February 10, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2022EXHIBIT (C) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT (A) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 17, 2022PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF AMENDED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 15, 2022DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: March 22, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 04, 2022DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: March 23, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 09, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021026822
Date: July 12, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE FOR TRIAL (SENT TO JUDGE FALVEY)
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: June 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL (SENT TO JUDGE FALVEY) | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.