Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates,Llc, filed a(n) Civil Petition (Limited Juris) case against Leila Flores, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Petition (Limited Juris) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time87 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 03/11/10 Not Applicable |
|
March 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONFIRMING THE ARBITRATION AWARD IS GRANTED Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORD CONFIRMING ARB AWARD TO RM 103 FOR FILING Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT TO RM 103 FOR FILING Not Applicable |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION TO/FOR CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION TO/FOR CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION WAS SET FOR 2/26/10 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09 Not Applicable |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CIVIL PETITION FILED 12/14/2009 OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC AS TO LEILA FLORES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/19/10 Not Applicable |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED ON BEHALF OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC Not Applicable |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO NON-APPEARANCE FILED ON BEHALF OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.