Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITILE
Date: May 20, 2021PAYMENT $525.50 RECEIPT #2021019888
Date: May 20, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: May 20, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS E - Recorded (OR.3166.2469. / 2021034365)
Date: May 20, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: May 20, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-UNSERVED
Date: July 05, 2021CITRUS COUNTYS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: July 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: July 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: June 25, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: June 30, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION UNEXECUTED ( PROCESSED 6/9)
Date: June 02, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE OF ACTION ( EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH/INQUIRY
Date: June 02, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: May 26, 2022RETURNED MAIL- MDD 5/26 REMAILED 7/8
Date: July 08, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED
Date: July 21, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TAX TITLE E - Recorded (OR.3326.2105. / 2022070101)
Date: October 10, 2022NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF LIENS
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH/INQUIRY
Date: June 01, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION)
Date: June 22, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT TO QUIET TAX TITLE
Date: July 29, 2022RETURNED MAIL- 7/21 MDD
Date: August 03, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TAX TITLE E - Recorded (OR.3326.2105. / 2022070101) | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- 7/21 MDD | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT TO QUIET TAX TITLE | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SATISFACTION OF LIENS | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED | |
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- MDD 5/26 REMAILED 7/8 | |
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION (NOTICE OF ACTION) | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.