Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts Circuit with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3197.2303. / 2021057918)
Date: August 19, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-UNSERVED
Date: June 23, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: July 15, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - E - RECORDED (OR.3162.2296. / 2021030789)
Date: May 05, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED
Date: June 16, 2021ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM
Date: July 01, 2021PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: August 03, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: August 04, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION (ADDRESS UNKNOWN)
Date: June 29, 2021NOTICE OF ACTION UNEXECUTED (PROCESSED 6/29)
Date: June 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY
Date: June 23, 2021OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: July 15, 2021ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM/GUARDIAN AD LITEMAND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM
Date: July 29, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: May 05, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: May 05, 2021PAYMENT $55.00 RECEIPT #2021019363
Date: May 18, 2021LETTER OF COLLECTION
Date: May 06, 2021PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021017825
Date: May 06, 2021COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3197.2303. / 2021057918) | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM/GUARDIAN AD LITEMAND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT/DEFAULT - ENTERED | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION (ADDRESS UNKNOWN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.