Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: January 08, 2021DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: March 04, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: March 15, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AS TO COUNT 1
Date: March 04, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 03, 2021DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE RECORD ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHING FIRM AND NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: January 26, 2022FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 17, 2022DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE DISCOVERY
Date: October 27, 2021DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODCUTION
Date: December 15, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 22, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL
Date: March 04, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021001042
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: September 13, 2022RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: September 20, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 19, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 12, 2022MEDIATION REPORT
Date: October 18, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: April 07, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: July 01, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: August 12, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION
Date: August 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 28, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2021PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIONS OF DOCUMENTS
Date: January 08, 2021PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 08, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - NOTICE OF FILING | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VIRTUAL MEDIATION | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.