Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with THOMAS, PATRICIA V presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 10, 2018COVER SHEET
Date: March 31, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: March 31, 2017MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: August 16, 2017ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: May 11, 2017REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 11, 2017PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017011003
Date: April 03, 2017NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.2933.1104. / 2018052415)
Date: October 13, 2018DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 30, 2017NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: August 31, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: August 21, 2018PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 10, 2018PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 20, 2017NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Date: May 30, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 30, 2017NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 30, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 18, 2017PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, ASHLEY MAE KAVANAUGH
Date: March 31, 2017ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 08, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: March 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.2933.1104. / 2018052415) | |
October 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.