Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recoveryassociates,Llc, filed a(n) Civil Petition (Limited Juris) case against In B Youn, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Petition (Limited Juris) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION Not Applicable |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR Not Applicable |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE Not Applicable |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR DISMISSAL FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Not Applicable |
|
May 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION TO/FOR CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBIRATION AWARD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC - Minutes COMPLETED |
|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION TO/FOR CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBIRATION AWARD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC - Minutes NOT HEARD/CONT |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION TO/FOR CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC - Minutes OFF-CALENDAR |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION WAS SET FOR 2/26/10 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 02 Not Applicable |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON PETITION WAS SET FOR 2/26/10 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 29 - RESCHEDULED TO: Not Applicable |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF/TO NON APPEARANCE PURSUANT TO CRC 321(C) FILED ON BEHALF OF PORTFOLIO RECOVERYASSOCIATES,LLC Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.