Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Punta Gorda Hma Llc Dba Shorepoint Health Punta Gorda, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Archdeacon, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2024 |
CategoryMatters Involving Claims 501 - 2500 |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS REQUEST
Date: March 14, 2024SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: April 10, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 14, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT ARCHDEACON -SERVED 4/5/24
Date: April 09, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT ARCHDEACON
Date: March 14, 2024RETURN OF SERVICE - ROBERT ARCHDEACON - RETURNED SERVED - 04/05/2024
Date: April 10, 2024STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 14, 2024SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE RECORD - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT
Date: April 16, 2024PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2024021409
Date: March 14, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE RECORD - CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - ROBERT ARCHDEACON - RETURNED SERVED - 04/05/2024 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ROBERT ARCHDEACON -SERVED 4/5/24 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS REQUEST | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROBERT ARCHDEACON | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2024021409 | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/14/2024 CASE NUMBER 24000455SP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.