Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Davis, Jean, Davis, Teresa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ferrer, Daniel, against Kin Interinsurance Network, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2024 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.