Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Goldsmith, Gus A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gable, Michael P, against Party, Unknown, Peace By Peace, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2024 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Residential Foreclosure > 250,001 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.