Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Brizzolara, Edward, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Kin Interinsurance Network, represented by Fluet, Nicole M, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2023 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedApril 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
EXHIBIT A
Date: October 30, 2023PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023044907
Date: September 28, 2023REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 30, 2023DEFENDANT KIN INTERINSURANCE NETWORK'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: October 30, 2023SUMMONS REQUEST- ISSUED KIN INTERINSURANCE NETWORK 9/28/2023
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT A
Date: February 09, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING - 04/29/2024 @ 01:30 PM
Date: February 13, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 28, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - PROCESS
Date: October 23, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 21, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 28, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: April 30, 2024CORRESPONDENCE
Date: September 28, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION - KIN INTERINSURANCE NETWORK
Date: November 20, 2023DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: February 09, 2024RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 21, 2024STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: September 28, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY NICOLE M. FLUET, ESQ.
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT C
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 08, 2024EXHIBIT B
Date: October 30, 20239/28/2023
Date: May 05, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 03, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 01, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 10, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 18, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 01, 2071Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2071 | Docket Event | ||
May 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.