Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ksd Partners, Llc, An Ohio Limited Liability Compa, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fileman Law Firm, P.A., A Florida Corporation, Punta Gorda Health Investors, Llc, A Florida Limit, represented by Tiseo, Albert Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2023 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
11/3/2023
Date: April 02, 202411/15/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/11/2024
Date: April 04, 20241/4/2024
Date: April 27, 206112/1/2023
Date: April 03, 202411/10/2023
Date: April 25, 20241/9/2024
Date: April 08, 202411/10/2023
Date: April 05, 20241/4/2024
Date: April 05, 20246/13/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/19/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/5/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/27/2023
Date: April 01, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/28/2023
Date: April 01, 20248/21/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/6/2023
Date: April 01, 20246/13/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/11/2023
Date: April 04, 20249/1/2023
Date: April 03, 20246/13/2023
Date: April 09, 20249/15/2023
Date: April 03, 20248/9/2023
Date: April 02, 202410/9/2023
Date: April 24, 20248/10/2023
Date: April 03, 20247/24/2023
Date: April 01, 202410/9/2023
Date: April 13, 20247/5/2023
Date: April 02, 202410/3/2023
Date: April 02, 20248/16/2023
Date: April 04, 20246/13/2023
Date: April 18, 20246/28/2023
Date: April 04, 20246/13/2023
Date: April 03, 20248/16/2023
Date: April 02, 202410/9/2023
Date: April 29, 20246/13/2023
Date: April 11, 202410/9/2023
Date: April 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2061 | Docket Event | ||
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.